Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 20:47:01 (UTC).

KELSO, TYLER JAMES

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 KELSO, TYLER JAMES was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KELSO, TYLER JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketREPORTOF LEGAL CHANGE OF NAME, STATE OF FLORIDA, OFFICE OF VITAL STATISTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketOF FINAL JUDGMENT -NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $6.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020020256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 4 TOTAL ASSESSED $6.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 4 TOTAL ASSESSED $6.00 BALANCE REMAINING $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 4 ASSESSED AT SUM $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketRECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE ON FINAL JUDGEMENT FOR CHANGE OF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 ASSESSED AT SUM $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020DR000779DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 5/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less