This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 08/19/2022 at 14:29:14 (UTC).

KAPITUS SERVICING, INC. VS POINT BLANK CONSTRUCTION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 KAPITUS SERVICING, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against POINT BLANK CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAPITUS SERVICING, INC.

Defendants

POINT BLANK CONSTRUCTION INC

WALKER, KIP M

Not Classified By Court

WALKER, KIP MCKENDRIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIEUCHOWICZ, ILAN A

Defendant Attorney

WIGGINS, CHARLES THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/20/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/20/2022:COMPLAINT

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

07/21/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED POINT BLANK CONSTRUCTION, INC.

07/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED POINT BLANK CONSTRUCTION, INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KIP WALKER

07/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KIP WALKER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR DEFENDANTS COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KIP WALKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED POINT BLANK CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KIP WALKER A/K/A KIP MCKENDRIE WALKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED POINT BLANK CONSTRUCTION, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022025560

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CA000489CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POINT BLANK CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where KAPITUS SERVICING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIGGINS, CHARLES THOMAS