This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 06/04/2021 at 15:01:06 (UTC).

JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION VS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATI Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATI. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SIMON, JOHN FRANKLIN JR, DRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN and DRAKE JR, CLIFTON ALAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SIMON, JOHN FRANKLIN JR

DRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN

DRAKE JR, CLIFTON ALAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION

Defendants

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATI

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

PARSONS, TAMMY R

PARSONS, JEFFERY BRUCE

Not Classified By Court

COUNTRYWIDE BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAZ, ROY ALAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JEFFERY BRUCE PARSONS ON 05/14/21

05/25/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JEFFERY BRUCE PARSONS ON 05/14/21

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TAMMY PARSONS 5-14-21

05/25/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TAMMY PARSONS 5-14-21

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED mortgage electronic registration sysytems 5-17-21

05/25/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED mortgage electronic registration sysytems 5-17-21

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED unknown tenant 2

05/25/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED unknown tenant 2

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

05/25/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

05/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TAMMY R. PARSONS

05/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TAMMY R. PARSONS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE BANK, NA

05/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC AS NOMINEE FOR COUNTRYWIDE BANK, NA

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEFFERY BRUCE PARSONS

05/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEFFERY BRUCE PARSONS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

05/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

05/05/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

05/05/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

05/05/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

05/05/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

05/05/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

LIS PENDENS

05/05/2021:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/05/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketJUDGE REASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: DRAKE JR, CLIFTON ALAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JEFFERY BRUCE PARSONS ON 05/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TAMMY PARSONS 5-14-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED mortgage electronic registration sysytems 5-17-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED unknown tenant 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TAMMY R. PARSONS

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,955.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021018585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,955.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,955.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021CA000375CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 5/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diaz, Roy Alan