This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/28/2020 at 16:22:51 (UTC).

JONES, CRYSTAL VS JONES, WILLIAM BLAKE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2012 JONES, CRYSTAL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JONES, WILLIAM BLAKE. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SIMON JR, JOHN F, MILLER, JOHN L, DAVID RIMMER and MICHELE INERE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SIMON JR, JOHN F

MILLER, JOHN L

DAVID RIMMER

MICHELE INERE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONES, CRYSTAL

Respondent

JONES, WILLIAM BLAKE

Not Classified By Court

JONES, WILLIAM BLAKE SR

JONES, WILLIAM B SR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketRECORDED FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE WILLIAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/14/2016 - JUDGE DAVID RIMMER PRESIDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketMOTION AND NOTICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION- HEARING DATE 9/14/2016 2PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE CRYSTAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketRETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE CRYSTAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $33.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2012039387

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketPAY FINE OR FILING WITH A DUE DATE 11/9/2012 UPDATED WITH COMPLIANCE ACTION OF SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $33.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketPAY FINE OR FILING DUE 11/9/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $33.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketJUDGE: MILLER , JOHN L ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketPAY FINE OR FILING DUE 11/9/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $397.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less