This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/28/2020 at 19:26:42 (UTC).

JONES, ALANZO F VS SULLIVAN, TIMARAH

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 JONES, ALANZO F filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SULLIVAN, TIMARAH. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONES, ALANZO F

Respondent

SULLIVAN, TIMARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

WHEATON, WYNDI L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF FILED BY ALANZO ON 2-1-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF 02/01/2019 - ALANZO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGIANL OR ENFORCEMENT PROCEEDINGS AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCITN OF DOCUMENTS TO PETITIONER-ALANZO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketLETTER TO MR. JONES FROM KAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketAmended Notice OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE, ATTY WYNDI L. WHEATON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL OF ATTY WHEATON OBO TIMARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: WYNDI L WHEATON UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCE -APPROVED/ALANZO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED DATE CHANGED TO 2/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE, SERVED TIMARAH 12/13/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF -ALANZO (INDIGENT FORM NEEDED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TIMARAH OBO NEVAEH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH TIMESHARING WITH MINOR CHILD - ALANZO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCASE 572019DR000247DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketJUDGE: MAGISTRATE , MICHELE INERE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHEATON, WYNDI L