This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/14/2022 at 14:08:20 (UTC).

JACQUISH AS TRUSTEE, PAMELA T. VS CALDWELL, AMBER

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 JACQUISH AS TRUSTEE, PAMELA T filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CALDWELL, AMBER. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAQUISH AS TRUSTEE, PAMELA T.

Defendant

CALDWELL, AMBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, ANGELA J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/14/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

09/14/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

COMPLAINT

09/14/2022:COMPLAINT

COVER LETTER INCLUDING SUMMONS PREPARATION REQUEST

09/14/2022:COVER LETTER INCLUDING SUMMONS PREPARATION REQUEST

SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMBER CALDWELL

09/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMBER CALDWELL

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

09/21/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AMBER CALDWELL 9-12-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO AMBER CALDWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER INCLUDING SUMMONS PREPARATION REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $202.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022032335

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $202.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001776CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES, ANGELA J