This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/29/2021 at 16:47:04 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER VS WILLIS, GARY MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIS, GARY MITCHELL. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GIRAUD, TONY and MICHELLE INERE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GIRAUD, TONY

MICHELLE INERE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

WILLIS, GARY MITCHELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARY WILLIS

07/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO GARY WILLIS

SUMMONS PROPOSED

06/29/2021:SUMMONS PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/01/2021 10:15; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE VIDEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO GARY WILLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 11/1/2021 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021026727

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $185.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021SC001718SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R