This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 03/14/2019 at 14:22:09 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER VS SANFORD, DENIA

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANFORD, DENIA. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

SANFORD, DENIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEELE, ANTHONY JOHN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUB DENIA SANFORD 2-25-19

03/06/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUB DENIA SANFORD 2-25-19

SUMMONS ISSUED DENIA SANFORD EMAILED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

02/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DENIA SANFORD EMAILED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

02/18/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUB DENIA SANFORD 2-25-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DENIA SANFORD EMAILED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $410.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019007749

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $410.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • CASE 572019CA000128CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 2/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEELE, ANTHONY JOHN