Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/25/2019 at 16:35:17 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER VS JOHNSON, TYWANNA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHNSON, TYWANNA. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

JOHNSON, TYWANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TYWANNA JOHNSON

07/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TYWANNA JOHNSON

SUMMONS PROPOSED

07/01/2019:SUMMONS PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Update Event SC PRE TRIAL CONFER on 9/17/2019 0900 AM Judge MICHELE INERE MAGISTRATE results 7/16/2019 on DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORDED ORDER SETTLEMENT STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TYWANNA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • EVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/17/2019 - JUDGE MICHELE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019029487

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • CASE 572019SC001445SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Event Date: 09/17/2019 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: MX 217

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R