This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/28/2022 at 16:57:48 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER VS HOLDERNESS, RENEE

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOLDERNESS, RENEE. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE INERE and HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MICHELLE INERE

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

HOLDERNESS, RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

09/30/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/15/2022 13:30; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ZOOM H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED RENEE HOLDERNESS ON 10/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED RENEE HOLDERNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 11/15/2022 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING AT 1:30 PM CST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022034302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022SC001899SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R