This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 02/16/2022 at 16:57:02 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER VS HENDERSON, JEANETTE E

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HENDERSON, JEANETTE E. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE INERE and GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MICHELLE INERE

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

HENDERSON, JEANETTE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/17/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

01/18/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEANETTE HENDERSON

01/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEANETTE HENDERSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/12/2022 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ZOOM H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JEANETTE HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 4/12/2022 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING AT 9:00 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022002032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $185.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS Proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022SC000148SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R