This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 05/03/2019 at 14:20:17 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER VS BROWN, SUSAN

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BROWN, SUSAN. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

BROWN, SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEELE, ANTHONY JOHN

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

01/21/2020:RECEIPT

LETTER TO CLERK - CERTIFY AND RECORD

01/21/2020:LETTER TO CLERK - CERTIFY AND RECORD

RETURN OF SERVICE SUSAN BROWN SERVED 4/28/19

05/02/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SUSAN BROWN SERVED 4/28/19

SUMMONS ISSUED SUSAN BROWN EMAILED TO ATTY

04/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SUSAN BROWN EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

04/09/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SUSAN BROWN SERVED 4/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED SUSAN BROWN EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $410.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019016517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $410.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • CASE 572019CA000278CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 4/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEELE, ANTHONY JOHN