Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/02/2021 at 16:45:36 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER VS ADKISSON, EMILY S

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADKISSON, EMILY S. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT and MICHELLE INERE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

MICHELLE INERE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

ADKISSON, EMILY S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO EMILY S. ADKISSON ON 06/05/21

06/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO EMILY S. ADKISSON ON 06/05/21

COMPLAINT

06/02/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED EMILY ADKISSON

06/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED EMILY ADKISSON

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

06/02/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/13/2021 13:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE VIDEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO EMILY S. ADKISSON ON 06/05/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMILY ADKISSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 7/13/2021 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021022443

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021SC001455SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R