This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:10:00 (UTC).

HIDDEN SHORES HOMEOWNERS ASSOC VS MULLERY, KELLY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 HIDDEN SHORES HOMEOWNERS ASSOC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MULLERY, KELLY. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIDDEN SHORES HOMEOWNERS ASSOC

Defendants

TWO, UNKNOWN TENANT

MULLERY, KELLY

ONE, UNKNOWN TENANT

MULLERY, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORHEAD, STEPHEN REID

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE KELLY MULLERY 11/25/19

01/31/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE KELLY MULLERY 11/25/19

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY MULLERY

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY MULLERY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

LIS PENDENS

11/18/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE KELLY MULLERY 11/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY MULLERY UNKNOWN TENANT ONE UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY MULLERY UNKNOWN TENANT ONE UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT TWO DISMISSED 1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT ONE DISMISSED 1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketUNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLY MULLERY DISMISSED 1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketANSWER-KELLY MULLERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $468.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019051593

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $468.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $468.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000855CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less