Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 14:18:10 (UTC).

HESTER, ANGELA VS CHAVIS, AUDREY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 HESTER, ANGELA filed an Other lawsuit against CHAVIS, AUDREY. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HESTER, ANGELA

Defendants

CHAVIS, AUDREY

CHAVIS, DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROYAL, ADAM LYNN

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW

08/31/2020:ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW

STIPULATION OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT

01/30/2020:STIPULATION OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DEEM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AN ANSWER

01/15/2020:PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DEEM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AN ANSWER

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND REQUEST TO DOCKET

01/15/2020:NOTICE OF TRIAL AND REQUEST TO DOCKET

MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

01/14/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

SUMMONS ISSUED AUDREY CHAVIS (EMAILED)

01/02/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED AUDREY CHAVIS (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED DONALD CHAVIS (EMAILED)

01/02/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED DONALD CHAVIS (EMAILED)

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

01/02/2020:COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/02/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketStipulation for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DEEM DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AN ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL AND REQUEST TO DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AUDREY CHAVIS (EMAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DONALD CHAVIS (EMAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCOVER LETTER INCLUDING SUMMONS PREPARATION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $334.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020000116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $334.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $334.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CC000003CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROYAL, ADAM L