This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/30/2021 at 14:36:19 (UTC).

HATCHER, DENNIS COYE JR, HATCHER, PAMELA HARRIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 HATCHER, DENNIS COYE JR, HATCHER, PAMELA HARRIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK, LACEY POWELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

HATCHER, DENNIS COYE JR

MANNING, KIMBERLEY H

Decedent

HATCHER, PAMELA HARRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ANDREWS, ROY VAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF HEARING AND CONSENT TO ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD DENNIS HATCHER, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (ORIGINAL) - PAMELA HARRIS HATCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION KIMBERLY MANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: ROY V ANDREWS UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021037122

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $400.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021CP000494CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREWS, ROY VAN