Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 19:54:45 (UTC).

GREENE, PETER VS GREENE, DENISE

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 GREENE, PETER filed an Other lawsuit against GREENE, DENISE. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREENE, PETER

Defendant

GREENE, DENISE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY DENISE GREENE

06/10/2020:ANSWER FILED BY DENISE GREENE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DENISE GREENE 6-4-20

06/08/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DENISE GREENE 6-4-20

SUMMONS ISSUED DENISE T. GREENE

06/02/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED DENISE T. GREENE

RECEIPT

06/01/2020:RECEIPT

SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

06/01/2020:SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/01/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DENISE GREENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DENISE GREENE 6-4-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DENISE T. GREENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $313.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020020750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $313.50 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $313.50 BALANCE REMAINING $313.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CC000983CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less