This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 21:28:52 (UTC).

FULMER, LORI ANN VS NAME, CHANGE

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 FULMER, LORI ANN filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against NAME, CHANGE. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SIMON, JOHN FRANKLIN JR. and SIMON JR, JOHN FRANKLIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SIMON, JOHN FRANKLIN JR.

SIMON JR, JOHN FRANKLIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FULMER, LORI ANN

Respondent

NAME, CHANGE

Not Classified By Court

OWENS, LORI ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketREPORT OF LEGAL CHANGE OF NAME-STTAET OF FLORIDA-DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH OFFICE OF VITAL STATISTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketREPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT -NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketRECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO MS. FULMER FROM KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $402.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020020085

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $402.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketMARRIAGE LICENSE- LORI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)- LORI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS- LORI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $402.00 BALANCE REMAINING $402.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020DR000825DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 5/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: SIMON JR, JOHN FRANKLIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less