This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:08:49 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS KIMBERLY ROSATI, UNKNOWN SPOUS Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KIMBERLY ROSATI, UNKNOWN SPOUS. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

TENANT, UNKNOWN

KIMBERLY ROSATI, UNKNOWN SPOUS

ROSATI, KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, CHRISTINE LANKEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL

03/06/2020:NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO COUNSEL

01/31/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO COUNSEL

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KIMBERLY ROSATI 11-30-19

01/07/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KIMBERLY ROSATI 11-30-19

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/07/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COPY OF SUSPENDED TRANSACTION FROM RECORDING DEPARTMENT

11/27/2019:COPY OF SUSPENDED TRANSACTION FROM RECORDING DEPARTMENT

COPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT

11/22/2019:COPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIMBERLY ROSATI

12/05/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIMBERLY ROSATI

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KIMBERLY ROSATI 11-30-19

12/05/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KIMBERLY ROSATI 11-30-19

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT

12/04/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT

LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

11/22/2019:LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION- EMAILED

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION- EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KIMBERLY ROSATI A/K/A KIMBERLY DAWN GUBRUD - EMAILED

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO KIMBERLY ROSATI A/K/A KIMBERLY DAWN GUBRUD - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIMBERLY ROSATI a/k/a KIMBERLY DAWN GUBRUD

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIMBERLY ROSATI a/k/a KIMBERLY DAWN GUBRUD

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

LIS PENDENS

11/14/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUSPENDED TRANSACTION RETURNED TO US WITH APPRORIATE FEE FORWARDED TO RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KIMBERLY ROSATI 11-30-19

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $935.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019051138

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $935.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000848CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less