This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 12/25/2020 at 14:25:50 (UTC).

FOSTER, GARY VS CHAPMAN, RORY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 FOSTER, GARY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CHAPMAN, RORY. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOSTER, GARY

Defendant

CHAPMAN, RORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABA, DANIEL PAUL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED RORY CHAPMAN 12/2/20

12/04/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED RORY CHAPMAN 12/2/20

SUMMONS ISSUED RORY CHAPMAN

12/02/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED RORY CHAPMAN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION FOR PROVIDING A RESPONSE TO SUMMONS/LAWSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED RORY CHAPMAN 12/2/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED RORY CHAPMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY: PREPARATION OF SUMMONS INSTRUCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EJECTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $417.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020041582

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $417.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $417.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CA000537CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less