This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 06/08/2022 at 04:35:41 (UTC).

DUNCAN, BOBBY, DUNCAN, LYDIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 DUNCAN, BOBBY, DUNCAN, LYDIA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLARK, LACEY POWELL and OBERLIESEN, DAVID JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

OBERLIESEN, DAVID JAMES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EDGEFIELD HOLDINGS, LLC

Not Classified By Court

PULLUM, MARTHA SUE

PULLUM, BETTY JEAN

PULLUM, BETTY JEANNE

PULLUM, JEANNE

DUNCAN, ROBERT

DUNCAN, BOBBY

DUNCAN, RONALD

DUNCAN, RONNY

DUNCAN, LYDIA

STUCKEY, PAULA LUANN

DUNCAN, SANDRA

PULLUM, BART RANDALL

STUCKEY, PAULA LOUANN

KILPATRICK, D. KEITH

Decedent

PULLUM, BETTY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SILVER, SCOTT H

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KILPATRICK, DONALD KEITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketJUDGE REASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: OBERLIESEN , DAVID JAMES ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketJUDGE REASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: OBERLIESEN , DAVID JAMES ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketJUDGE REASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: OBERLIESEN , DAVID JAMES ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $169.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY EDGEFIELD HOLDINGS, LLC - $529,375.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $169.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $231.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021037242

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $231.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021CP000498CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDGEFIELD HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KILPATRICK, DONALD KEITH