This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 11/11/2021 at 17:10:27 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS WARD, PAMELA

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WARD, PAMELA. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE INERE and HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MICHELLE INERE

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WARD, PAMELA

Navarre, FL 32566

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT HAROLD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/13/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/13/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS PROPOSED

10/13/2021:SUMMONS PROPOSED

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

10/14/2021:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

10/15/2021:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAMELA WARD

10/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAMELA WARD

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON PAMELA WARD

11/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON PAMELA WARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/08/2022 09:40; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ZOOM H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON PAMELA WARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PAMELA WARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 2/8/2022 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING AT 9:40 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021038769

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021SC002469SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKETT BRETT H