This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:13:00 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS GIBBS, DONNIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GIBBS, DONNIE. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C

Defendants

GIBBS, DONNIE

GIBBS, JACQUELINE E

Not Classified By Court

GIBBS, JACQULINE

GIBBS, JACQUELINE

GIBBS, JACQUELINE PINKNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANNESS, JOHN ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JACQUELINE E GIBBS A/K/A JACQUELINE GIBBS ON 12/16/19

12/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JACQUELINE E GIBBS A/K/A JACQUELINE GIBBS ON 12/16/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO DONALD GIBBS ON 12/16/19

12/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO DONALD GIBBS ON 12/16/19

SUMMONS ISSUED JACQUELINE E. GIBBS EMAILED TO ATTY

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JACQUELINE E. GIBBS EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED DONNIE GIBBS EMAILED ATTY

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DONNIE GIBBS EMAILED ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

LIS PENDENS

11/19/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT JACQUELINE GIBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JACQUELINE E GIBBS A/K/A JACQUELINE GIBBS ON 12/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO DONALD GIBBS ON 12/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JACQUELINE E. GIBBS EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DONNIE GIBBS EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $925.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019051691

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $925.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $925.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000858CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less