This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/07/2019 at 14:30:53 (UTC).

D'AMICO, CINDY GAY, D'AMICO, CORY FREDERICK Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 D'AMICO, CINDY GAY, D'AMICO, CORY FREDERICK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN, ROSS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN, ROSS

 

Party Details

Decedent

D'AMICO, CORY FREDERICK

Not Classified By Court

FETTER, DAVID PAUL

DAMICO, CINDY GAY

D'AMICO, CINDY GAY

DAMICO, CORY FREDERICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SHERRILL, RICHARD NORTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • ORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • CP RECORDED ORDER LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • CP RECORDED ORDER LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • PROPOSED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • OATH TO WITNESS WILL - ANDRINA M GOETZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • CHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (TESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $412.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019027106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $412.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $412.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • CASE 572019CP000277CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.