This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 15:12:00 (UTC).

CULLEN, CHAD EDWARD, CULLEN, CHELSEA NICOLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 CULLEN, CHAD EDWARD, CULLEN, CHELSEA NICOLE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN, ROSS MATHEW. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN, ROSS MATHEW

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEE, CANDICE CULLEN

Not Classified By Court

CULLEN, KEITH PAUL

CULLEN, CHELSEA NICOLE

CULLEN, CHAD EDWARD

Decedent

CULLEN, KEITH JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAMSON, ANDY WAYNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $12.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020026864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $12.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCP RECORDED ORDER -ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCP RECORDED ORDER -ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCP RECORDED ORDER -LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) -KEITH JOSEPH CULLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION GREATER THAN $1,000 -TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $345.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020012068

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $345.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CP000101CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 3/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMSON, ANDY WAYNE