This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 14:19:11 (UTC).

COASTAL CREDIT, L.L.C. VS MORRIS, MILAGROS P.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 COASTAL CREDIT, L L C filed an Other lawsuit against MORRIS, MILAGROS P. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COASTAL CREDIT, L.L.C.

Defendant

MORRIS, MILAGROS P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBELLO, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

12/14/2020:RECEIPT

LETTER TO CLERK

12/14/2020:LETTER TO CLERK

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MILAGROS MORRIS 01/11/20

01/16/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MILAGROS MORRIS 01/11/20

SUMMONS ISSUED MILAGROS MORRIS (EMAILED)

12/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MILAGROS MORRIS (EMAILED)

SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

12/30/2019:SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/30/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER RATIFYING STIPILATION AND CLOSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MILAGROS MORRIS 01/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MILAGROS MORRIS (EMAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019057328

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CC002998CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTAL CREDIT, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lobello, Thomas, III