This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 08/25/2022 at 14:46:09 (UTC).

Clerk of Court for Santa Rosa VS Bank of New York Mellon Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Clerk of Court for Santa Rosa filed an Other lawsuit against Bank of New York Mellon. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clerk of Court for Santa Rosa

Defendants

PEGUES, JAMES

PEGUES, TIFFANY

Bank of New York Mellon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER, TRAVIS RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

STEVENS, ADAM JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

07/26/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

07/26/2022:COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES E. PEQUES

07/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES E. PEQUES

SUMMONS ISSUED TIFFANY D. PEGUES

07/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TIFFANY D. PEGUES

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON 7/27/22

07/28/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON 7/27/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES PEGUES

08/03/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES PEGUES

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED TIFFANY PEGUES

08/03/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED TIFFANY PEGUES

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

08/05/2022:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST TIFFANY D PEGUES AND JAMES E PEGUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK PROPOSED AS TO TIFFANY PEGUES AND JAMES PEGUES ONLY PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO TIFFANY PEGUES AND JAMES PEGUES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STREAMLINED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR BANK OF NEW YOURK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED TIFFANY PEGUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES PEGUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $430.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022026168

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CA000501CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stevens, Adam Jeffrey