This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/06/2019 at 10:39:01 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC. VS MCKNIGHT, NANCY L Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 CITIMORTGAGE INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MCKNIGHT, NANCY L. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIMORTGAGE INC.

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY L. MCK

MCKNIGHT, NANCY L

SANTA ROSA COUNTY, A POLITICAL

Not Classified By Court

CLARK, NANCY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Defendant Attorney

ANDREWS, ROY VAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED NANCY CLARK EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED NANCY CLARK EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED SANTA ROSA COUNTY EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SANTA ROSA COUNTY EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY MCKNIGHT EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY MCKNIGHT EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

LETTER TO CLERK

03/07/2019:LETTER TO CLERK

PROPOSED ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

08/05/2019:PROPOSED ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

10/07/2019:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR JANUARY 30, 2020

01/16/2020:MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR JANUARY 30, 2020

RECORDED ORDER ORDER ON REQUEST TO EXTEND SALE

01/16/2020:RECORDED ORDER ORDER ON REQUEST TO EXTEND SALE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

01/20/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF SALE 3-31-20

02/28/2020:NOTICE OF SALE 3-31-20

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/17/2020:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR MARCH 31, 2020

03/19/2020:MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR MARCH 31, 2020

PROOF OF PUBLICATION SALE DATE 3/31/20

03/23/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION SALE DATE 3/31/20

RECORDED ORDER TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ,DISMISS ACTION,DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

04/07/2021:RECORDED ORDER TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ,DISMISS ACTION,DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY L. MCKNIGHT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY 2/8/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT SERVED SUB NANCY MCKNIGHT 2-7-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: ROY V ANDREWS UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketANSWER SANTA ROSA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketLETTER WITH CHECK TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY MCKNIGHT EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $935.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019004831

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $935.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $935.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000074CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA ROSA COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREWS, ROY VAN