This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 12/01/2022 at 14:43:35 (UTC).

Citimortgage Inc VS GLENN BARRETT, WILLIAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Citimortgage Inc filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against GLENN BARRETT, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citimortgage Inc

Defendants

GLENN BARRETT, WILLIAM

State Of Florida Department Of

POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN TENANT

POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN TENANT

WILLIAM GLENN BARRETT, UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILLIAM GLENN BARRETT ON 11/18/2022

11/23/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILLIAM GLENN BARRETT ON 11/18/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

11/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM GLENN BARRETT

11/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM GLENN BARRETT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE ON 11/14/2022

11/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE ON 11/14/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

11/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BARRETT

11/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BARRETT

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

11/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

11/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENIE

11/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENIE

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

11/01/2022:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/01/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

11/01/2022:NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

11/01/2022:VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

SUMMONS ISSUED WILLIAM BARRETT

11/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED WILLIAM BARRETT

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

11/02/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

11/01/2022:COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/01/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/01/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILLIAM GLENN BARRETT ON 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM GLENN BARRETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE ON 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM BARRETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WILLIAM BARRETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $450.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022038200

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CA000759CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ