This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 09/20/2019 at 14:02:13 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS GALPO, ELAINE G

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed an Other lawsuit against GALPO, ELAINE G. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

GALPO, ELAINE G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELAINE GALPO 09/12/19

09/17/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELAINE GALPO 09/12/19

SUMMONS ISSUED ELAINE GALPO

08/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ELAINE GALPO

SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

08/27/2019:SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELAINE GALPO 09/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ELAINE GALPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019038346

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • CASE 572019CC001995CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 8/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel