This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 14:46:25 (UTC).

CHERRY, GLORIA K, KENDRICK, LUCILLE J Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 CHERRY, GLORIA K, KENDRICK, LUCILLE J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN, ROSS MATHEW. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN, ROSS MATHEW

 

Party Details

Decedent

KENDRICK, LUCILLE J

Not Classified By Court

CHERRY, GLORIA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HUSTON, GARY WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCP RECORDED ORDER -ORDER ADMITTING FOREIGN WILL TO RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING FOREIGN WILL TO RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEXEMPLIFIED COPIES FROM PROBATE COURT DAVIDSON COUNTY, STATE OF TENNESSEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO ADMIT FOREIGN WILL TO RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $231.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020009382

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $231.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CP000080CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 2/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUSTON, GARY WILLIAM