This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/13/2022 at 14:06:51 (UTC).

CGF HOUSING LLC VS CORLEY, MATTHEW Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 CGF HOUSING LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CORLEY, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CGF HOUSING LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANTS,

CORLEY, MATTHEW

Not Classified By Court

CORLEY, MATTHEW ELLEC

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

09/13/2022:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WRIT OF POSSESSION BY POSTING ON 09/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO PLAINTIFF WITH WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCIVIL RECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS VIA POSTING 09/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED MATTHEW CORLEY VIA POSTING 09/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MATTHEW CORLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $205.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022032167

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001770CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less