Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 14:15:28 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE VS RAU, VIRGINIA MARIE

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE filed an Other lawsuit against RAU, VIRGINIA MARIE. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE

Defendant

RAU, VIRGINIA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

Defendant Attorney

MOST, JESSICA ILENE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/29/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VIRGINIA RAU 01/13/20

01/13/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VIRGINIA RAU 01/13/20

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS (proposed)

12/27/2019:SUMMONS (proposed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketRECORDED SETTLEMENT STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: JESSICA I MOST UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VIRGINIA RAU 01/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019057152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (proposed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CC002990CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOST , JESSICA I