Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 15:12:50 (UTC).

CASH MONEY CAPITAL LLC VS DENISE, DEHLIN SONYA

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 CASH MONEY CAPITAL LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DENISE, DEHLIN SONYA. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASH MONEY CAPITAL LLC

Defendant

DENISE, DEHLIN SONYA

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING HEARING

02/19/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS -proposed WRIT POSSESSION

02/11/2020:ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS -proposed WRIT POSSESSION

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - proposed NOTICE OF HEARING

02/11/2020:ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - proposed NOTICE OF HEARING

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - proposed FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

02/11/2020:ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - proposed FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

PROPOSED ORDER WRIT OF POSSESSION---EMAILED

02/07/2020:PROPOSED ORDER WRIT OF POSSESSION---EMAILED

PROPOSED ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER----EMAILED

02/07/2020:PROPOSED ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER----EMAILED

NOTICE OF HEARING--PROPOSED---EMAILED

02/07/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING--PROPOSED---EMAILED

RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER

02/03/2020:RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO DEHLIN SONYA DENISE ON 01/28/20

02/03/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO DEHLIN SONYA DENISE ON 01/28/20

SUMMONS ISSUED DEHLIN SONYA DENISE SRSO FOR SERVICE

01/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED DEHLIN SONYA DENISE SRSO FOR SERVICE

RECEIPT

01/27/2020:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL DEHLIN DENISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SONYA DEHLIN SERVED 03/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS -proposed WRIT POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - proposed NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - proposed FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER WRIT OF POSSESSION---EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DEHLIN SONYA DENISE SRSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020003906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CC000172CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less