This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 11:02:52 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES L VS BAUER, ROBERT J Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES L filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BAUER, ROBERT J. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES L

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

NEAL, MELODY ANN

LIGHTHOUSE POINTE HOMEOWNERS A

OF SCOTT ALLEN NEA, UNKNOWN SP

OF MELODY ANN NEAL, UNKNOWN SP

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

NEAL, SCOTT ALLEN

BAUER, ROBERT J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

Defendant Attorney

BLANKENSHIP, ALLISON SUZANNE

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO CLERK

02/19/2020:LETTER TO CLERK

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELODY NEAL

01/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELODY NEAL

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

01/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ANSWER by lighthouse homeowners

12/10/2019:ANSWER by lighthouse homeowners

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LIGHTHOUSE POINTE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION 11/25/19

12/04/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LIGHTHOUSE POINTE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION 11/25/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MELODY NEAL 11/27/19

12/04/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MELODY NEAL 11/27/19

LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

11/20/2019:LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELODY NEAL (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELODY NEAL (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2 (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2 (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED SCOTT NEAL (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SCOTT NEAL (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED MELODY NEAL (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MELODY NEAL (EMAILED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

LIS PENDENS

11/13/2019:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

11/13/2019:COMPLAINT

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE and RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION - TO ROBERT J BAUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING- CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - ROBERT BAUER, SCOTT ALLEN NEAL A/K/A SCOTT A NEAL A/K/A SCOTT NEAL, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SCOTT ALLEN NEAL A/K/A SCOTT A. NEAL A/K/A SCOTT NEAL - ENVELOPE TO GULF BREEZE NEWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY - ROBERT J. BAUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SCOTT ALLEN NEAL A/K/A SCOTT A. NEAL A/K/A SCOTT NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY - SCOTT ALLEN NEAL A/K/A SCOTT A. NEAL A/K/A SCOTT NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $985.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019050798

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $985.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $985.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000841CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less