This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/22/2022 at 16:48:45 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE NA VS VAN NOSKE, CHRISTOPHER R

Case Summary

On 09/24/2022 CAPITAL ONE NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VAN NOSKE, CHRISTOPHER R. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT and MICHELLE INERE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

MICHELLE INERE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE NA

Defendant

VAN NOSKE, CHRISTOPHER R

Gulf Breeze, FL 32563-8664

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/24/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

09/27/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER VAN NOSKE

10/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER VAN NOSKE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/08/2022 14:30; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ZOOM H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER VAN NOSKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 11/8/2022 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING AT 2:30 PM CST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022033800

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022SC001871SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel