This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 04/24/2019 at 16:31:19 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS JEFFREY A WEBBER

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JEFFREY A WEBBER. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, JOSE A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, JOSE A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

JEFFREY A WEBBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS PROPOSED

04/03/2019:SUMMONS PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED JEFFREY WEBBER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JEFFREY WEBBER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED JEFFREY WEBBER 4-11-19

04/17/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED JEFFREY WEBBER 4-11-19

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED JEFFREY WEBBER 4-11-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JEFFREY WEBBER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • EVENT SCHEDULED ON 6/11/2019 - JUDGE MICHELE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019015610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $185.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • CASE 572019SC000784SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 4/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Event Date: 06/11/2019 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: MX 217

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel