Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/23/2019 at 16:31:45 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS HATCHER, DERRICK S

Case Summary

On 06/29/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HATCHER, DERRICK S. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

HATCHER, DERRICK S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE DERRICK HATCHER SERVED 07/15/19

07/19/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE DERRICK HATCHER SERVED 07/15/19

SUMMONS ISSUED DERRICK HATCHER

07/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DERRICK HATCHER

SUMMONS PROPOSED

06/29/2019:SUMMONS PROPOSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE DERRICK HATCHER SERVED 07/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DERRICK HATCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • EVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/17/2019 - JUDGE MICHELE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019029236

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • CASE 572019SC001429SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Event Date: 09/17/2019 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: MX 217

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel