This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 14:16:01 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS CONLEY, MELINDA K

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed an Other lawsuit against CONLEY, MELINDA K. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

CONLEY, MELINDA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MELINDA CONLEY

12/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MELINDA CONLEY

SUMMONS (proposed)

12/30/2019:SUMMONS (proposed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MELINDA CONLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019057389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (proposed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CC003000CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2019
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel