This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 04/15/2019 at 14:22:12 (UTC).

BRUCE, JOHN G VS METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 BRUCE, JOHN G filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKEY, DARLENE F. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKEY, DARLENE F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUCE, JOHN G

Defendant

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, CHARLES PHILIP

Defendant Attorney

BARBOUR, JEPTHA F

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

03/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

COMPLAINT

03/22/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • ATTORNEY: JEPTHA F BARBOUR UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $417.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019013566

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $417.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $417.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • CASE 572019CA000223CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 3/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARBOUR, JEPTHA F