This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:09:03 (UTC).

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPA VS #1, TENANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 1, TENANT. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPA

Defendants

HARVEST POINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOC

#2, TENANT

TRENTON B THOMPSON, UNKNOWN SP

CLARIDGE, LANEY S

THOMPSON, TINA LOUISE

THOMPSON, TRENTON B

#1, TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COPLEN, ROBERT MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO CLERK - RECORD LIS PENDENS

11/26/2019:LETTER TO CLERK - RECORD LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRENTON B. THOMPSON - EMAILED

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRENTON B. THOMPSON - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRENTON B THOMPSON - EMAILED

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRENTON B THOMPSON - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED HARVEST OINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. EMAILED TO ATTY

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED HARVEST OINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED TENANT 2 (EMAILED)

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TENANT 2 (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TENANT 1 (EMAILED)

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TENANT 1 (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED LANEY CLARIDGE (EMAILED)

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED LANEY CLARIDGE (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED HARVEST POINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (EMAILED)

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED HARVEST POINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (EMAILED)

LIS PENDENS

11/19/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK - RECORD LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRENTON B. THOMPSON - EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TRENTON B THOMPSON - EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HARVEST OINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketVERIFICATION FORM FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,029.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019051847

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,029.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,029.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000861CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less