This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 12/20/2021 at 21:00:40 (UTC).

BENJAMIN, HOWARD Et Al VS BAKER, TAMMY Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 BENJAMIN, HOWARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BAKER, TAMMY. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENJAMIN, KATHLEEN

BENJAMIN, HOWARD

Defendants

BAKER, TAMMY

EMERALD COAST RV CENTER LLC DB

JAYCO RV INC

LAWSON, WILLIAM

LCI INDUSTRIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLAM, CHRIS W

Defendant Attorneys

STOVER, HEATHER LORRAINE

BARAUSKAS, ALEKSAS ANDRIUS

KOVEN, IAN L

 

Court Documents

RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT JAYCO RV INC ONLY

10/28/2021:RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT JAYCO RV INC ONLY

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

10/28/2021:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/22/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/10/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/07/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED EMERALD COAST RV 7-28-21

08/24/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED EMERALD COAST RV 7-28-21

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED JAYCO RV INC7-27-21

08/24/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED JAYCO RV INC7-27-21

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED LCI INDUSTRES 8-12-21

08/24/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED LCI INDUSTRES 8-12-21

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED WILLIAM LAWSON 8-10-21

08/24/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED WILLIAM LAWSON 8-10-21

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TAMMY BAKER 8-2-21

08/24/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TAMMY BAKER 8-2-21

NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

08/24/2021:NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

08/11/2021:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/11/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

08/06/2021:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

08/06/2021:DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE HEATHER L STOVER ESQUIRE FOR TAMMY BAKER

08/06/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE HEATHER L STOVER ESQUIRE FOR TAMMY BAKER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE HEATHER L STOVER FOR DEFENDANT EMERALD COAST RV CENTER LLC DBA GANDER RV

08/06/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE HEATHER L STOVER FOR DEFENDANT EMERALD COAST RV CENTER LLC DBA GANDER RV

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE HOWARD BENJAMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF KATHLEEN BENJAMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF HOWARD BENJAMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF KATHLEEN BENJAMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT LIPPERT COMPONENT INCS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT JAYCO RV INC ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketJAYCO RV INC DISMISSED 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021CA000711CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERLAD COAST RV CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAUSKAS, ALEKSAS ANDRIUS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOVEN, IAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOVER , HEATHER LORRAINE