This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/07/2019 14:32:20

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Probate - Other Probate case was filed by BELL, BOBBI RENE, LOWELL, DAWN DENISE in the jurisdiction of Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Probate - Other Probate
  • Jurisdiction Santa Rosa County Courts
  • Judge GOODMAN, ROSS
  • Courthouse Santa Rosa County Courthouse
  • County Santa Rosa
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Petitioner SIMPSON, JUNE ANN
  • Represented By
    • MAGAHA, ZACHARY TAYLOR
  • Petitioner BELL, BOBBI RENE
  • Represented By
    • MAGAHA, ZACHARY TAYLOR
  • Petitioner LOWELL, DAWN DENISE
  • Represented By
    • MAGAHA, ZACHARY TAYLOR
  • Decedent LOWELL, ROBERT SCOTT
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE
  • 06/26/2019
  • CP RECORDED ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION
  • 06/26/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION
  • 06/26/2019
  • CP RECORDED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY
  • 06/26/2019
  • ORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD
  • 06/26/2019
  • CP RECORDED ORDER LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT
  • 06/26/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE
  • 06/24/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ROBERT SCOTT LOWELL
  • 06/19/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION -TESTATE
  • 06/19/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD REAL PROPERTY
  • 06/19/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE
  • 06/14/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL) 19-WD-75 FILED 05/22/2019
  • 06/14/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
  • 06/14/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD REAL PROPERTY
  • 06/14/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - TESTATE
  • 06/14/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $345.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019027056
  • 06/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $345.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $345.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.