This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 12/22/2021 at 14:27:30 (UTC).

B&E HOLDINGS, LLC VS HOLLY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT A Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 B E HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOLLY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT A. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B&E HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendants

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

PEGUES, TIFFANY D.

PEGUES, JAMES E.

HOLLY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ, KRISTOPHER EMIL

Defendant Attorney

DROSKY, TODD CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

11/22/2021:LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/22/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/22/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/22/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/22/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

11/23/2021:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED TIFFANY PEGUES

11/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TIFFANY PEGUES

SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES PEGUES

11/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES PEGUES

SUMMONS ISSUED THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

11/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

SUMMONS ISSUED HOLLY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION

11/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED HOLLY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONS MOTOIN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPONDTO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: TODD CHRISTOPHER DROSKY UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HOLLY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JAMES PEGUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TIFFANY PEGUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $508.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021043758

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $508.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $508.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021CA000957CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLEY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNANDEZ KRISTOPHER E