Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/19/2019 at 16:32:39 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS LOVETT, ROBERT S

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOVETT, ROBERT S. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, JOSE A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, JOSE A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

LOVETT, ROBERT S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ROBERT LOVETT 07/15/19

07/15/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ROBERT LOVETT 07/15/19

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT S LOVETT - PRE-TRIAL DATE 09/17/19 @ 9:00 am - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT S LOVETT - PRE-TRIAL DATE 09/17/19 @ 9:00 am - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS PROPOSED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ROBERT LOVETT 07/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT S LOVETT - PRE-TRIAL DATE 09/17/19 @ 9:00 am - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • EVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/17/2019 - JUDGE MICHELE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019029026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • CASE 572019SC001422SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Event Date: 09/17/2019 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: MX 217

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY