This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:13:51 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N A VS BREWER THIBODEAUX, MOLLIE S Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BREWER THIBODEAUX, MOLLIE S. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N A

Defendants

THIBODEAUX, CLIFFORD

BREWER THIBODEAUX, MOLLIE S

UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFITHS, HEATHER LYNN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED CHARLOTTE ROBERTS

03/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED CHARLOTTE ROBERTS

SUMMONS ISSUED KIM THIBODEAUX

03/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED KIM THIBODEAUX

SUMMONS ISSUED ALAN THIBODEAX

03/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED ALAN THIBODEAX

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN HEIRE OR BENEFICIARIES

03/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN HEIRE OR BENEFICIARIES

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

03/20/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

03/20/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

03/20/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

03/20/2020:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED RUBY DENISE WHITE EMAILED TO ATTY

01/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED RUBY DENISE WHITE EMAILED TO ATTY

COMPLAINT

11/19/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED CLIFFORD THIBODEAUX (EMAILED)

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CLIFFORD THIBODEAUX (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MOLLIE S. BREWER-THIBODEAUX A/K/A MOLLIE S. THIBODEAUX A/K/A MOLLIE S. BREWER THIBODEAUX A/K/A MOLLIE S. BREWER-TIBODEA - EMAILED

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MOLLIE S. BREWER-THIBODEAUX A/K/A MOLLIE S. THIBODEAUX A/K/A MOLLIE S. BREWER THIBODEAUX A/K/A MOLLIE S. BREWER-TIBODEA - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT - EMAILED

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT - EMAILED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

LIS PENDENS

11/19/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CHARLOTTE ROBERTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KIM THIBODEAUX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ALAN THIBODEAX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN HEIRE OR BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $40.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020013525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $40.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000863CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less