This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/19/2022 at 14:34:16 (UTC).

BAKER, JILL ANN, HOSKIN, CHARLES P. Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 BAKER, JILL ANN, HOSKIN, CHARLES P was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OBERLIESEN, DAVID JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OBERLIESEN, DAVID JAMES

 

Party Details

Decedent

NOBLIN, DEMARIS W.

Not Classified By Court

HOSKIN, CHARLES P.

Interested Parties

SHEERIN, BRIAN JAMES

SHEERIN, MARK DANIEL

BAKER, JILL ANN

HOSKIN, MICHAEL CHARLES

HOSKIN, KELLY LEE

SHEERIN, DEMARIS ANN

HOSKIN, SARA LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HOSKIN, CHARLES PATTERSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - SUMMATION WEEKLY 09/28/22 & 10/05/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL) 22-WD-137 FILED ON 9/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - TESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) - DEMARIS W NOBLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022032842

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CP000456CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOSKIN, CHARLES P