Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/25/2019 at 16:35:37 (UTC).

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY VS SANDBOX BOYZ, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANDBOX BOYZ, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, JOSE A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, JOSE A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SANDBOX BOYZ, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLANTON, CURTIS HUGH

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CHRISTIPHER BUTTRILL 7-10-19

07/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CHRISTIPHER BUTTRILL 7-10-19

SUMMONS ISSUED SANDBOX BOYZ LLC

07/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SANDBOX BOYZ LLC

SUMMONS PROPOSED

07/01/2019:SUMMONS PROPOSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SANDBOX BOYZ LLC 7-10-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED SANDBOX BOYZ LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • EVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/17/2019 - JUDGE MICHELE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019029481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $185.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • CASE 572019SC001440SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Event Date: 09/17/2019 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: MX 217

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blanton, Curtis Hugh Jr