This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/28/2020 at 08:30:25 (UTC).

ANDREWS, ROY, ROADCAP, JOSEPH Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 ANDREWS, ROY, ROADCAP, JOSEPH was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON

 

Party Details

Appellant

ROADCAP, JOSEPH

Appellees

ANDREWS, ROY

SANTA ROSA COUNTY CODE ENFORCE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

08/17/2020:NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE

08/04/2020:NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketAPPEAL PREPARED AND FILED WITH CIRCUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: DICKEY , DARLENE FALLON ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020AP000084APAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 8/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketEMAIL FROM CODE ENFORCEMENT DIRECTOR REGARDING REQUEST TO APPEAL FILED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR APPEAL FORWARDED TO COUNTY ATTORNEY AND APPEALS DEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketREC JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT SENT TO RECORDING - DUPLICATE-NOT RECORDING THIS ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT SENT TO RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketEMAIL FROM DEFENDANT CONTESTING CITATIONS-WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCITATION - COUNTY ORDINANCE - NONCONFORMING USE OF RIM-TENTS SET UP ON PROPERTY - HOME OCCUPATION VIOLATION

    Read MoreRead Less