This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 03/06/2019 at 09:48:33 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS, Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS,

ROGERS, RALPH

Not Classified By Court

ROGERS, RALPH T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

Defendant Attorney

LOCKLIN, OSCAR JACKSON

 

Court Documents

ANSWER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS RALPH ROGERS A/K/A RALPH T ROGERS AND GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BULIDERS INC

02/05/2019:ANSWER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS RALPH ROGERS A/K/A RALPH T ROGERS AND GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BULIDERS INC

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

05/30/2019:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED RALPH ROGERS 1-17-19

01/21/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED RALPH ROGERS 1-17-19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED CORP GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS INC 1-17-19

01/21/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED CORP GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS INC 1-17-19

SUMMONS ISSUED GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED RALPH ROGERS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED RALPH ROGERS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

01/08/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

01/08/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

COMPLAINT

01/08/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • ANSWER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS RALPH ROGERS A/K/A RALPH T ROGERS AND GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BULIDERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • ATTORNEY: JACK LOCKLIN JR UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • ATTORNEY: JACK LOCKLIN JR UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED RALPH ROGERS 1-17-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SERVED CORP GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS INC 1-17-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED GENESIS CUSTOM HOME BUILDERS INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED RALPH ROGERS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019001215

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $420.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • CASE 572019CA000010CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.